NV IP1 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to voter registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to voter registration.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-03-22AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-03-22AssemblyInitiative petition read.
2017-03-22AssemblyReturned from Governor.
2017-03-21AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-03-16AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-03-14AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-03-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-03-10SenateRead second time.
2017-03-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-02-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2017-02-23SenateIn Senate.
2017-02-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate.
2017-02-21AssemblyRead second time.
2017-02-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-06AssemblyReferred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time.
2017-02-06AssemblyReceived from Secretary of State.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback