NV AJR7 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - In Assembly. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the Congress of the United States to pass the National Infrastructure Bank Act of 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges the Congress of the United States to pass the National Infrastructure Bank Act of 2020. (BDR R-765)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2021-05-04SenateResolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-05-03SenateTaken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day.
2021-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-04-14SenateResolution read. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
2021-04-14SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-13AssemblyResolution read. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-12AssemblyResolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 160.) To printer.
2021-04-09AssemblyPlaced on Resolution File for next legislative day.
2021-04-09AssemblyTaken from Resolution File.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-09AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-08AssemblyResolution read. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback