NV AJR6 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging Congress to prevent the United States Census Bureau from adding a citizenship question to the 2020 decennial census.
Title
Urges Congress to prevent the United States Census Bureau from adding a citizenship question to the 2020 decennial census. (BDR R-279)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Assembly | File No. 25. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Without recommendation. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 454.) To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |