NV AJR5A | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR5
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - File No. 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - File No. 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove the constitutional provisions governing the election and duties of the Board of Regents of the State University and to authorize the Legislature to provide by statute for the governance, control and management of the State University and for the reasonable protection of individual academic freedom.
Title
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove the constitutional provisions governing the election and duties of the Board of Regents of the State University and to authorize the Legislature to provide by statute for the governance, control and management of the State University and for the reasonable protection of individual academic freedom. (BDR C-60)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Assembly | File No. 14. |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Returned from Secretary of State. |
Same As/Similar To
AJR5 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - File No. 34.