NV AJR3 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - File No. 30.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - File No. 30.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging various actions relating to the protection and conservation of land and water.
Title
Urges various actions relating to the protection and conservation of land and water. (BDR R-775)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Assembly | File No. 30. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | To Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Taken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Action of adoption rescinded. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Resolution read and adopted. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |