NV AJR3 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File No. 23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the Nevada Greater Sage-Grouse Conservation Plan and
Title
Expresses support for the Nevada Greater Sage-Grouse Conservation Plan and the Nevada Conservation Credit System and urges the United States Bureau of Land Management to require compensatory mitigation to offset anthropogenic disturbances in accordance with the Nevada Conservation Credit System. (BDR R-511)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Assembly | File No. 23. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |