NV AJR2 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR2A
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - File No. 35.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - File No. 35.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging Congress to oppose the expansion of the United States Air Force into the Desert National Wildlife Refuge in Nevada.
Title
Urges Congress to reject any expansion in the use of land or exercise of jurisdiction by the United States Air Force in the Desert National Wildlife Refuge. (BDR R-697)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Assembly | File No. 35. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 798 and 884 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 884.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 798.) To printer. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 50.) To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |
Same As/Similar To
AJR2 (Carry Over) 2019-06-01 - File No. 35.