NV AJR1A | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Note: Carryover of previous AJR1

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)

Summary

Proposing to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions governing the taxation of mines, mining claims and the proceeds of minerals extracted in this State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions governing the taxation of mines, mining claims and the proceeds of minerals extracted in this State. (BDR C-25)

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01Assembly(No further action taken.)
2021-04-09AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 8, 2021.
2021-02-04AssemblyTo committee.
2021-02-01AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-02-01AssemblyResolution read. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.
2021-02-01AssemblyReturned from Secretary of State.

Same As/Similar To

AJR1 (Carry Over) 2019-06-01 - File No. 34.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback