NV AJR10 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR10A
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - File No. 24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - File No. 24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing to amend the Ordinance of the Nevada Constitution and the Nevada Constitution to remove language authorizing the use of slavery and involuntary servitude as a criminal punishment.
Title
Proposes to amend the Ordinance of the Nevada Constitution and the Nevada Constitution to remove language authorizing the use of slavery and involuntary servitude as a criminal punishment. (BDR C-496)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Assembly | File No. 24. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Resolution read. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Resolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 189.) To printer. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Taken from Resolution File. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Same As/Similar To
AJR10 (Carry Over) 2021-05-21 - File No. 24.