NV ACR5 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-29 - File No. 28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing support for the Lake Tahoe Transportation Action Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses support for the Lake Tahoe Transportation Action Plan. (BDR R-387)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-29AssemblyFile No. 28.
2023-05-29AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
2023-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2023-05-26SenateResolution read and adopted. To Assembly.
2023-05-25SenateTaken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day.
2023-05-24SenateTaken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day.
2023-05-23SenateTaken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day.
2023-05-22SenateTaken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day.
2023-05-19SenateFrom committee: Be adopted.
2023-04-17SenateResolution read. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.
2023-04-17SenateIn Senate.
2023-04-13AssemblyResolution read and adopted. To Senate.
2023-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted.
2023-03-20AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-17AssemblyResolution read. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback