NV AB92 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 398.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 398.
Summary
Revises the provisions governing the benefits of a retired justice or judge. (BDR 1-400)
Title
Revises the provisions governing the benefits of a retired justice or judge. (BDR 1-400)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 398. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-18 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 688.) To printer. | |
2009-05-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-02 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=206 |