NV AB88 | 2009 | 75th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 471.

Summary

Makes various changes relating to child pornography. (BDR 15-267)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to child pornography. (BDR 15-267)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-08 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 471.
2009-06-04 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2009-06-03 To enrollment.
2009-06-03 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
2009-06-02 To printer.
2009-06-01 Conference report adopted by Senate.
2009-06-01 From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 690 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
2009-05-30 Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.
2009-05-30 In Assembly.
2009-05-30 Senate Amendment No. 690 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
2009-05-30 In Senate.
2009-05-29 Senate Amendment No. 690 not concurred in. To Senate.
2009-05-21 In Assembly.
2009-05-20 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2009-05-20 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2009-05-19 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 690.) To printer.
2009-05-18 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-04-20 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2009-04-20 In Senate.
2009-04-17 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.
2009-04-17 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2009-04-16 Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 469.) To printer.
2009-04-16 Placed on General File.
2009-04-16 Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2009-04-10 Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
2009-04-10 Taken from General File.
2009-04-09 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2009-04-06 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2009-04-03 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2009-04-02 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 64.) To printer.
2009-04-01 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-02-02 Read first time. To committee.
2008-12-17 From printer.
2008-12-15 Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback