NV AB85 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 116.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 116.
Summary
Provides for the formation of a committee to study laws concerning sex offender registration. (BDR 14-259)
Title
Provides for the formation of a committee to study laws concerning sex offender registration. (BDR 14-259)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 116. | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-05 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-04 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-02 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-01 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-20 | To Senate. | |
2009-04-20 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-17 | To printer. | |
2009-04-17 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) | |
2009-04-17 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-04-17 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-04-17 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 254.) | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-17 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=184 |