NV AB82 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring public schools to provide pupils with certain instruction in the founding principles of American government; requiring the Department of Education to submit reports to certain committees of the Legislature; requiring the Department to make available to teachers certain opportunities for professional development regarding the required instruction in the founding principles of American government; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires that instruction in the founding principles of American government be specifically included in public schools. (BDR 34-206)
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7351/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB82.pdf |