NV AB80 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal justice; creating the Department of Sentencing Policy; providing for the appointment of the Executive Director and the selection of the staff of the Department; establishing the duties of the Executive Director and staff of the Department; revising the membership of the Nevada Sentencing Commission; transferring the responsibility for staffing the Nevada Sentencing Commission to the Department; revising the duties of the Nevada Sentencing Commission to reflect the newly created Department; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to the Nevada Sentencing Commission. (BDR 14-469)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Chapter 484. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 903.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | To committee. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 38.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-20 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |