NV AB77 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 568.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to optometry; authorizing an assistant to perform activities relating to optometry under certain circumstances; providing for the certification of a mobile optometry clinic; providing for certification by endorsement to treat a person diagnosed with glaucoma; revising the acts which constitute the practice of optometry; revising certain exemptions relating to the practice of optometry; revising provisions governing the Nevada State Board of Optometry and the Executive Director of the Board; revising provisions governing the preparation of a roster of licensees; authorizing the Board to adopt certain policies; requiring the Board to establish, review and revise a schedule of fees; revising provisions which authorize the Board to impose certain penalties; revising provisions governing the qualification and examination of an applicant for a license to practice optometry; expanding the period required for the renewal of a license to practice optometry; revising provisions governing the restoration of a license to practice optometry; revising the requirements for certification to prescribe pharmaceutical agents; revising provisions governing the issuance of a certificate to treat glaucoma; revising certain provisions governing disciplinary actions against a licensee; revising provisions relating to the submission of a complaint against a licensee; revising provisions governing the location at which a licensee practices optometry; prohibiting an optometrist from entering into certain leases with a person who is not licensed as an optometrist; prohibiting a person from directly or indirectly supervising an optometrist under certain circumstances; revising provisions governing service of process and the transmission of certain notices by the Board; authorizing any licensed optometrist to administer topical diagnostic ophthalmic agents; revising provisions governing the issuance of an administrative fine for certain violations; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes to provisions governing the practice of optometry. (BDR 54-366)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13AssemblyChapter 568.
2019-06-12AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1051 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-01SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly.
2019-05-31SenateTo printer.
2019-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
2019-05-31SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-05-31SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1051.)
2019-05-31SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2019-05-31SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2019-05-30SenateRead second time.
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-28SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-05-28SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 897.) To printer.
2019-05-27AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-30AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-30AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-04-23AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 23, 2019.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 641.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.
2019-04-23AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-26AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-11-20AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback