NV AB74 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions governing document preparation services. (BDR 19-84)
Title
Establishes provisions governing document preparation services. (BDR 19-84)
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy Flores [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 535. |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | To printer. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 981 concurred in. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 981.) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 2, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 802.) To printer. |
2013-05-25 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2013-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | To committee. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 152.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2013-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2013-01-31 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |