NV AB70 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 566.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 566.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to meetings of public bodies; making various changes relating to meetings of public bodies; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the Open Meeting Law. (BDR 19-421)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Chapter 566. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Conference report adopted by Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 878 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment No. 878 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 878 not concurred in. To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 878.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 9, Excused: 2.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 647.) Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 577.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-20 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |