NV AB70 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 401.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 401.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the administration and enforcement of various provisions relating to medical marijuana. (BDR 32-322)
Title
Provides for the administration and enforcement of various provisions relating to medical marijuana. (BDR 32-322)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 401. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 863 concurred in. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 863.) To printer. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Notice of withdrawal on next legislative day. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | Action reconsidered. |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 21, Nays: 19, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-03-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2014-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-12-20 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |