NV AB67 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; revising provisions governing the employment of the Executive Director of the Achievement School District; providing for the creation of a new type of achievement charter school which is not operated by a charter management organization or educational management organization; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing achievement charter schools. (BDR 34-335)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-20 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6009/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB67.pdf |