NV AB62 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Nevada ABLE Savings Program; revising provisions governing regulations adopted to carry out the Program; authorizing the State Treasurer to apply for and accept any gift, grant, donation, bequest or other source of money to carry out the Program; revising provisions governing the Endowment Account established in the State General Fund related to the Program; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Nevada ABLE Savings Program. (BDR 38-397)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |