NV AB61 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 50.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to offenders; revising provisions relating to the residential confinement of offenders who are in a program of treatment for the abuse of alcohol or drugs; requiring the Department of Corrections and the Division of Parole and Probation of the Department of Public Safety to notify victims of certain information relating to residential confinement in certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the authority of the Director of the Department of Corrections to assign certain offenders to serve a term of residential confinement. (BDR 16-203)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 50.
2019-05-10AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-19SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-19SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-18AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 203.) To printer.
2019-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-11-19AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback