NV AB58 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 124.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 124.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state parks; revising provisions governing violations of regulations adopted by the Administrator of the Division of State Parks of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing violations of regulations adopted by the Administrator of the Division of State Parks of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources. (BDR 35-212)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Chapter 124. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-19 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |