NV AB561 | 2011 | 76th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Chapter 476.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes concerning governmental financial administration. (BDR 31-1166)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes concerning governmental financial administration. (BDR 31-1166)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-17 Chapter 476.
2011-06-16 Approved by the Governor.
2011-06-16 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2011-06-06 In Assembly. To enrollment.
2011-06-06 Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
2011-06-06 From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2011-06-06 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To committee.
2011-06-06 In Senate.
2011-06-06 To Senate.
2011-06-06 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2011-06-05 To printer.
2011-06-05 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.)
2011-06-05 Dispensed with reprinting.
2011-06-05 Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 930.)
2011-06-05 Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2011-06-05 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-04-04 Notice of exemption.
2011-03-30 From printer. To committee.
2011-03-28 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback