NV AB556 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 318.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 318.
Summary
Eliminates the position of Weed Control Analyst within the State Department of Agriculture. (BDR 49-1314)
Title
Eliminates the position of Weed Control Analyst within the State Department of Agriculture. (BDR 49-1314)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 318. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-14 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-05-14 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1138 |