NV AB55 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the City of North Las Vegas; providing for the creation, membership and duties of a Charter Committee; making certain grammatical and clarifying changes to the Charter of the City of North Las Vegas; revising provisions relating to special and emergency meetings of the City Council; revising the procedure for enacting city ordinances; making various changes to the duties of the City Clerk; revising the powers of the City Council relating to animals; revising provisions relating to the removal of the City Attorney; authorizing the City Manager and City Attorney to take certain legal action for the collection and disposition of certain money; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes to the Charter of the City of North Las Vegas. (BDR S-368)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 551 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 551.) To printer. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 347.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |