NV AB537 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 609.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 609.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; providing that the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources and the Division of Environmental Protection of the Department are authorized to impose remedies other than civil penalties for violations of certain environmental laws; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to certain penalties imposed by the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources. (BDR 40-1270)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Chapter 609. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 11, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 893.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Action of referral rescinded. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. |