NV AB535 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 540.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to tobacco products; increasing the annual license fee for a license to engage in business as a wholesale dealer of cigarettes; establishing an annual license fee for a license to engage in certain other businesses related to cigarettes or other tobacco products; revising provisions governing the use of the money collected from certain annual license fees; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to cigarettes and other tobacco products. (BDR 32-1242)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13AssemblyChapter 540.
2019-06-12AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.
2019-06-01SenateRead second time.
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-28SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
2019-05-28SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 937.) To printer.
2019-05-27AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback