NV AB533 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cannabis; creating the Cannabis Advisory Commission; prescribing the membership and duties of the Commission; creating the Cannabis Compliance Board; prescribing the membership and duties of the Board; transferring the authority to license and regulate persons and establishments engaged in certain activities relating to cannabis from the Department of Taxation to the Board; repealing, reenacting, revising and reorganizing certain provisions related to cannabis; establishing requirements relating to the delivery of cannabis and cannabis products to a consumer; revising provisions relating to inventory control systems; prohibiting a local government from licensing a business that allows consumption of cannabis on its premises; requiring the Department of Health and Human Services to adopt regulations relating to certain commodities or products made using industrial hemp and certain similar products; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to cannabis. (BDR 60-1217)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Chapter 595. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 6, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | To committee. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 942.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: May 6, 2019. |