NV AB529 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 598.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to unarmed combat; transferring the Nevada Athletic Commission from the Department of Business and Industry to the Office of the Governor; requiring the Governor to appoint an Executive Director for the Commission; authorizing the Executive Director to employ additional personnel; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the Nevada Athletic Commission. (BDR 41-1207)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13AssemblyChapter 598.
2019-06-12AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-06-03SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-06-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-06-03SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-06-03SenateIn Senate.
2019-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-10AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback