NV AB52 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 107.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 107.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; creating the Division of Natural Heritage within the Department; transferring the duties of the Nevada Natural Heritage Program to the Division; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Creates the Division of Natural Heritage within the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources. (BDR 18-217)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Chapter 107. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |