NV AB52 | 2009 | 75th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 469.

Summary

Revises provisions relating to public hospitals and requires hospitals in certain larger counties to provide a report of certain information concerning patients to the Legislative Committee on Health Care. (BDR40-448)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to public hospitals and requires hospitals in certain larger counties to provide a report of certain information concerning patients to the Legislative Committee on Health Care. (BDR40-448)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-08 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 469.
2009-06-04 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2009-06-03 To enrollment.
2009-06-03 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
2009-06-02 To printer.
2009-06-01 Conference report adopted by Senate.
2009-06-01 From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 615 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
2009-05-29 Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.
2009-05-29 In Assembly.
2009-05-28 Senate Amendment No. 615 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
2009-05-28 In Senate.
2009-05-27 Senate Amendment No. 615 not concurred in. To Senate.
2009-05-18 In Assembly.
2009-05-16 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2009-05-15 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2009-05-13 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2009-05-12 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 615.) To printer.
2009-05-11 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-04-20 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.
2009-04-20 In Senate.
2009-04-20 To Senate.
2009-04-20 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2009-04-17 To printer.
2009-04-17 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
2009-04-17 Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2009-04-17 Dispensed with reprinting.
2009-04-17 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 417.)
2009-04-17 Placed on Second Reading File.
2009-04-17 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-02-02 Read first time. To committee.
2008-12-07 From printer.
2008-12-06 Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback