NV AB514 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 516.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 516.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Division of Parole and Probation of the Department of Public Safety to provide money for transitional housing for indigent prisoners released on parole under certain circumstances. (BDR 16-1230)
Title
Authorizes the Division of Parole and Probation of the Department of Public Safety to provide money for transitional housing for indigent prisoners released on parole under certain circumstances. (BDR 16-1230)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 516. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |