NV AB507 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 448.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 448.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making appropriations to the Department of Corrections for the replacement of buses and other vehicles; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes appropriations to the Department of Corrections for the replacement of buses and other vehicles. (BDR S-1183)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 448. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |