NV AB503 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 498. (Effective June 15, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 498. (Effective June 15, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to background checks; establishing requirements relating to investigations into the criminal backgrounds of volunteers of a charter school, university school for profoundly gifted pupils or school district who are likely to have unsupervised contact with pupils; removing provisions authorizing the disclosure of information relating to the criminal history of an applicant for a license as a teacher or another educational personnel position to the administrator of a private school; removing certain requirements imposed on the Department of Education regarding persons whose applications for a license are denied because of a conviction of a sexual offense involving a minor; revising provisions concerning applicants for employment with a school district who are required to submit fingerprints to the school district; removing provisions requiring an applicant for employment with or employee of a private school or volunteer to submit fingerprints to the administrator of the private school and accordingly repealing provisions concerning exceptions to such a requirement; requiring applicants for certain licenses, certificates or permits to submit to the applicable regulatory body a complete set of fingerprints and written permission authorizing the applicable regulatory body to forward those fingerprints to the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History for its report on the criminal history of the applicant and for submission to the Federal Bureau of Investigation for its report on the criminal history of the applicant; removing the applicability of certain requirements to applicants for a license to practice any of the special branches of dental hygiene, dental therapy or dentistry; defining the term dentistry; revising provisions of the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact concerning the disclosure of certain information relating to licensed psychologists; defining certain terms relating to reports on the criminal history of certain persons associated with medical cannabis establishments and adult-use cannabis establishments; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises various provisions relating to background checks. (BDR 1-900)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Assembly | Chapter 498. (Effective June 15, 2023) |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 811.) To printer. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |