NV AB500 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Chapter 315. (Effective June 10, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT making a supplemental appropriation to the Office of Finance in the Office of the Governor for an unanticipated shortfall related to costs associated with the preparation of the statewide cost allocation plan; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes a supplemental appropriation to the Office of Finance in the Office of the Governor for an unanticipated shortfall related to costs associated with the preparation of the statewide cost allocation plan. (BDR S-1100)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-12AssemblyChapter 315. (Effective June 10, 2023)
2023-06-10AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2023-06-09AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-06-05AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2023-06-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2023-06-04SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-06-03SenateRead second time.
2023-06-03SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-06-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-05-31SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2023-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2023-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2023-05-30AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-29AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-26AssemblyRead second time.
2023-05-26AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-05-12AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2023-05-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback