NV AB498 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 529.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to electric utilities. (BDR 58-1297)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to electric utilities. (BDR 58-1297)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 529.
2015-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-04AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-06-01AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback