NV AB497 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 512.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises certain provisions relating to taxes. (BDR 22-1295)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises certain provisions relating to taxes. (BDR 22-1295)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 512.
2015-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2015-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-31AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-05-31AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Taxation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback