NV AB497 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313.
Summary
Provides for the collection and sharing of certain statistical data and information relating to the criminal justice system. (BDR 14-1154)
Title
Provides for the collection and sharing of certain statistical data and information relating to the criminal justice system. (BDR 14-1154)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-19 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-19 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-18 | To printer. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) | |
2009-05-18 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 836.) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-17 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-17 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-04-17 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-17 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 225.) To printer. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-06 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=958 |