NV AB495 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Chapter 63.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Chapter 63.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishes the Committee on Co-Occurring Disorders. (BDR 40-571)
Title
Abolishes the Committee on Co-Occurring Disorders. (BDR 40-571)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Chapter 63. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-03-27 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |