NV AB490 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the expenditure of money from the Account for Maintenance of State Park Facilities and Grounds. (BDR 35-902)
Title
Revises provisions governing the expenditure of money from the Account for Maintenance of State Park Facilities and Grounds. (BDR 35-902)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 18. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |