NV AB489 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the Revolving Account for Land Management. (BDR 26-907)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Revolving Account for Land Management. (BDR 26-907)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 542. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 845.) |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Action of referral rescinded. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |