NV AB488 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to measures passed by the 78th Legislative Session. (BDR S-1292)
Title
Makes technical corrections to measures passed by the 78th Legislative Session. (BDR S-1292)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464. |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |