NV AB488 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 346.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 346.
Summary
Revises provisions governing the employment of retired public employees. (BDR 23-782)
Title
Revises provisions governing the employment of retired public employees. (BDR 23-782)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 346. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Amendment No. 859 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 859.) To printer. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-15 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2009-05-15 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-13 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-13 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-12 | To printer. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) | |
2009-05-12 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-12 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 635.) | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-09 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-04-09 | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2009-03-30 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=940 |