NV AB485 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 352.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 352.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes relating to school vehicles. (BDR 43-36)
Title
Makes various changes relating to school vehicles. (BDR 43-36)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 352. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 812 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 812.) To printer. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 362.) To printer. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |