NV AB483 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 293.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 293.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the Program to Encourage and Facilitate Purchases by Agencies of Commodities and Services From Organizations. (BDR 27-911)
Title
Revises provisions governing the Program to Encourage and Facilitate Purchases by Agencies of Commodities and Services From Organizations. (BDR 27-911)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 293. |
2017-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |