NV AB480 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 85.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to written agreements; enacting provisions governing supported decision-making agreements; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts provisions governing supported decision-making agreements. (BDR 13-164)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 85.
2019-05-10AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-18SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead second time.
2019-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback