NV AB480 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 351.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 351.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the assessment of an administrative fee on certain public purchases. (BDR 27-899)
Title
Authorizes the assessment of an administrative fee on certain public purchases. (BDR 27-899)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 351. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |