NV AB477 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 370.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions concerning the duties of the Taxicab Administrator. (BDR 58-1192)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions concerning the duties of the Taxicab Administrator. (BDR 58-1192)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 370.
2015-06-01AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-30AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-05-28SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-28SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-21SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
2015-05-21SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-19AssemblyRead second time.
2015-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-03-26AssemblyNotice of exemption.
2015-03-25AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback