NV AB47 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to mental health; establishing a pilot program to respond to persons suffering from mental health crises in certain counties; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes an appropriation to the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services to establish a pilot program to address behavioral health crisis response in certain counties. (BDR S-501)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 127.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-25AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-11-16AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback